Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/22/2010