Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/16/2009