There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RISE Act of 2009
Removing Impediments to Students Education Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to repeal the provisions prohibiting persons convicted of drug offenses from receiving student financial assistance.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/22/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
10/22/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
07/22/2009Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/22/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/27/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/12/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor07/22/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness10/22/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3295.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3295. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/2009)

Removing Impediments to Students Education Act of 2009 or the RISE Act of 2009 - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to repeal a provision which makes persons convicted of drug offenses ineligible to receive federal student financial assistance for specified periods.

Requires institutions of higher education to notify students who lost eligibility for such assistance due to a drug conviction and had not regained it prior to this Act's enactment that they are now eligible for such assistance.