Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/22/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/27/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/12/2010