Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/30/2010