Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/23/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/27/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/28/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/29/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/29/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/08/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/17/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/15/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/22/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/22/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/24/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 08/10/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/16/2010