Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/31/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/31/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/06/2009