Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/11/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/19/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/16/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/21/2010