Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/19/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-118.
12/19/2009 Signed by President.
12/19/2009 Presented to President.
12/19/2009 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to the bill H.R. 3326 Yea-Nay Vote. 88 - 10. Record Vote Number: 384.(consideration: CR S13476)
12/16/2009 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 395 - 34 (Roll No. 985).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment: CR H15022-15040)
12/16/2009 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House now consider the measure Agreed to by voice vote.
10/06/2009 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Inouye; Byrd; Leahy; Harkin; Dorgan; Durbin; Feinstein; Mikulski; Kohl; Murray; Specter; Cochran; Bond; McConnell; Shelby; Gregg; Hutchison; Bennett; Brownback.(consideration: CR S10159)
10/06/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 7. Record Vote Number: 315.(text: CR 10/7/2009 S10228-10243)
09/10/2009 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-74.
07/30/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 400 - 30 (Roll no. 675).
07/24/2009 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-230, by Mr. Murtha.