Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/24/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/20/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/22/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/05/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/06/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/15/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/22/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/30/2010