Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/08/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/09/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/13/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/13/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/16/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/27/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/27/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/03/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/12/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/02/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/02/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/19/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/25/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/25/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/14/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/27/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/28/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/05/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/01/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/28/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/15/2010