Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010