Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/24/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/29/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/20/2010