Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/27/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/28/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/12/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010