Text: H.R.3357 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-46 (08/07/2009)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 46]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 123 STAT. 1970]]

Public Law 111-46
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
        To restore sums to the Highway Trust Fund and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Aug. 7, 2009 -  [H.R. 3357]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. FUNDING OF THE HIGHWAY TRUST FUND.

    Subsection (f) of section 9503 of the Internal Revenue Code of 
1986 <<NOTE: 26 USC 9503.>>  (relating to determination of trust fund 
balances after September 30, 1998) is amended--
            (1) by striking paragraph (2); and
            (2) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:
            ``(2) Increase in fund balance.--Out of money in the 
        Treasury not otherwise appropriated, there is hereby 
        appropriated (without fiscal year limitation) to the Highway 
        Trust Fund $7,000,000,000.''.
SEC. 2. ADVANCES TO THE UNEMPLOYMENT TRUST FUND AND OTHER FUNDS.

    The item relating to ``Department of Labor--Employment and Training 
Administration--Advances to the Unemployment Trust Fund and Other 
Funds'' in title I of division F of the Omnibus Appropriations Act, 2009 
(Public Law 111-8; 123 Stat. 754) is amended by striking ``to remain 
available through September 30, 2010'' and all that follows (before the 
heading for the following item) and inserting ``such sums as may be 
necessary''.
SEC. 3. FHA MORTGAGE INSURANCE COMMITMENT AUTHORITY.

    The item relating to ``Federal Housing Administration--Mutual 
Mortgage Insurance Program Account'' in title II of division I of the 
Omnibus Appropriations Act, 2009 (Public Law 111-8; 123 Stat. 966) is 
amended by striking ``$315,000,000,000'' and inserting 
``$400,000,000,000''.
SEC. 4. GNMA MORTGAGE-BACKED SECURITIES GUARANTEE COMMITMENT 
                    AUTHORITY.

    The item relating to ``Government National Mortgage Association--
Guarantees of Mortgage-Backed Securities Loan Guarantee

[[Page 123 STAT. 1971]]

Program Account'' in title II of division I of the Omnibus 
Appropriations Act, 2009 (Public Law 111-8; 123 Stat. 967) is amended by 
striking ``$300,000,000,000'' and inserting ``$400,000,000,000''.

    Approved August 7, 2009.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 3357:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 155 (2009):
            July 29, considered and passed House.
            July 30, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>