Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/30/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/05/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/05/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/07/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/07/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/19/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/09/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/14/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/09/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/09/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/09/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/09/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/09/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/09/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/09/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/09/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/10/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/10/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/10/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/10/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/10/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/10/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/10/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/10/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/10/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/10/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/15/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/01/2010