Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/22/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/26/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/26/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/28/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/28/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/03/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/13/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/25/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/09/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010