Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/25/2010