Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/23/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/09/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/21/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 08/10/2010