Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/28/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/13/2010