Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/08/2010