There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Promoting Lending to America's Small Businesses Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Credit Union Act to advance the ability of credit unions to promote small business growth and economic development opportunities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/29/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/29/2009Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/14/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/14/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/15/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/25/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/02/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/02/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/02/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/09/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/09/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/13/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/25/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/25/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/08/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services07/29/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3380. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/29/2009)

Promoting Lending to America's Small Businesses Act of 2009 - Amends the Federal Credit Union Act to increase the total permissible amount of member business loans by an insured credit union (excluding those made to nonprofit religious organizations) to a limit of 25% of the credit union's total assets.

Increases from $50,000 to $250,000 the maximum total extensions of credit a borrower or associated member of an insured credit union may have before any extension of credit shall be considered a member business loan.

Revises the prohibition against an increase in the total amount of member business loans by an undercapitalized insured credit union until it becomes adequately capitalized. Repeals the condition of becoming adequately capitalized, and requires only that the National Credit Union Administration Board approve the increase.

Excludes from the definition of "member business loan" any extension of credit, meeting other specified criteria, that is made to a member for commercial, corporate, business, farm, or agricultural purposes in an underserved area.