Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2010