Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 12/09/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 12/11/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/11/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/11/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/11/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/11/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/11/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/17/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/17/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/25/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/27/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/27/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/28/2010