Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/24/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/03/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/11/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/01/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/02/2010