Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/30/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/19/2009