Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/31/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/23/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/25/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/22/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/11/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/10/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/22/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/24/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/28/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/28/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/28/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/28/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/28/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/28/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/28/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/28/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/01/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/01/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/14/2010