Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/30/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/23/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/11/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/28/2010