Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/11/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew