Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/01/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/01/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/20/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/28/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/05/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/15/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/23/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/04/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/27/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/27/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/14/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew