Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/30/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/30/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/29/2010