Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/23/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/23/2010