Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/17/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/02/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2010