Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/20/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/29/2010