Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/2010