Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/27/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/03/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/30/2010