Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010