Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/06/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2010