Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/29/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/27/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/09/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 01/20/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/03/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/14/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/17/2010