Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/28/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/18/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/03/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/10/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/15/2010