Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/03/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/12/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010