Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/06/2009