Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/16/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/16/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/17/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/07/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/28/2010