Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/08/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/29/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/11/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/11/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/27/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/27/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/27/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/04/2010