Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/13/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/13/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/13/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/13/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/13/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 10/13/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/13/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/13/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/13/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/13/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/13/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/22/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/03/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/2010