There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterinarian Services Investment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterinarian Services Investment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Agricultural Research, Extension and Teaching Policy Act of 1977 to establish a grant program to promote efforts to develop, implement, and sustain veterinary services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6707-6708)
07/31/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
09/16/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
09/15/2010-12:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/15/2010-12:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6707-6708)
09/15/2010-12:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3519.
09/15/2010-12:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6707-6709)
09/15/2010-12:27pmHouseMr. Boswell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/28/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/28/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/31/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
07/31/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/17/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/24/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/27/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/04/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/03/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/22/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture07/31/2009 Referred to
07/28/2010 Markup by
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry09/16/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3519. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/15/2010)

Veterinarian Services Investment Act - Amends the National Agricultural Research, Extension, and Teaching Policy Act of 1977 to direct the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to carry out a matching grant program with qualified entities to develop, implement, and sustain veterinary services.

Requires a qualifying entity to carry out programs that: (1) relieve veterinarian shortage situations; (2) support private veterinary practices engaged in public health activities; or (3) support practices of veterinarians who are participating in or have successfully completed a specified service requirement.

Sets forth grant preference provisions.

Makes such grants available for: (1) assistance for establishing or expanding veterinary practices or establishing mobile veterinary facilities; (2) veterinarian, technician, and student recruitment; (3) grants to attend training programs in food safety or food animal medicine; (4) grants to establish or expand accredited education, internship, residency, and fellowship programs; (5) grants to assess veterinarian shortage situations; and (6) grants for continuing education and extension, including tele-veterinary medicine and other distance-based education.

Prohibits the use of grant funds for construction.

Subjects grants for establishing or expanding veterinary practices to: (1) an agreement between the Secretary and the recipient that includes a required term of service; and (2) remedies for breach of agreement, including repayment or partial repayment of grant funds.

Defines "qualified entity" as a: (1) for-profit or nonprofit entity in the United States that operates a rural veterinary clinic in response to a veterinarian shortage situation; (2) state, national, allied, or regional veterinary organization or specialty board recognized by the American Veterinary Medical Association; (3) college or school of veterinary medicine accredited by the American Veterinary Medical Association; (4) university research foundation or veterinary medical foundation; (5) department of veterinary science or department of comparative medicine accredited by the Department of Education; (6) state agricultural experiment station; or (7) state, local, or tribal government agency.

Authorizes appropriations beginning with FY2012.