Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/17/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/24/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/23/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/27/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/04/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/03/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/22/2010