Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/01/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/01/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/01/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/01/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/07/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/07/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/23/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/28/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/28/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/28/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/05/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/18/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/24/2010