Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/07/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2010