Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2010